Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Carter, and Washington
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an insurer, with respect to private passenger motor vehicle insurance, from rating a risk based, in whole or in part, on the credit history of an applicant or insured in any manner; repealing certain provisions of law authorizing an insurer to use the credit history of an applicant or insured to rate a new policy of private passenger motor vehicle insurance; applying the Act to all private passenger motor vehicle insurance policies issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after October 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0235 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Motor Vehicle Insurance - Use of Credit History in Rating Policies
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM