Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Military Dependents - In-State Tuition
Sponsored by
Senators Jacobs and Astle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting spouses and financially dependent children of active duty and retired members of the United States armed forces from paying nonresident tuition at a public institution of higher education in the State under specified circumstances.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
8/14/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 8/14/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-106.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM