Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Dental Examiners - Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Grounds for Discipline
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding specified grounds on which the State Board of Dental Examiners may take specified disciplinary action against applicants for a license to practice dentistry or dental hygiene, licensed dentists, or licensed dental hygienists.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2015
Legislative Date
1/15/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2015
Legislative Date
1/15/2015
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2015 1/15/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2015 1/15/2015 Hearing 1/28 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2015 2/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM