Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Private Career Schools
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh, Cassilly, and Salling
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the requirements for application for a senatorial scholarship to include students who are enrolled in private career schools; authorizing the use of a senatorial scholarship at private career schools in the State and outside the State, subject to certain conditions; authorizing recipients of a senatorial scholarship to hold the scholarship for 2 years if a full-time student and 4 years if a part-time student and otherwise meet certain conditions; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/09/2017
Legislative Date
8/09/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Private Career Schools
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {734535/1 Adopted
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Private Career Schools
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
37 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/09/2017 8/09/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Private Career Schools
Senate 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {734535/1 Adopted 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Higher Education - Senatorial Scholarships - Private Career Schools
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Referred Ways and Means 37 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
(   18-402, 18-405, 18-406, 18-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page