Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the University of Maryland Extension to provide a dedicated extension agent to assist individuals with the adoption of management-intensive farming and grazing practices; requiring the Governor to provide at least $500,000 each year to support the Department of Agriculture's activities related to management-intensive farming and grazing, beginning in fiscal year 2022; authorizing the Department of Agriculture to use its allocation from the Bay Restoration Fund to fund management-intensive grazing activities; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0364 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2020
Legislative Date
1/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2020 1/15/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM