Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing - Name Change
Sponsored by
Senators Forehand, Montgomery, Astle, Brinkley, Feldman, Glassman, Kelley, Kittleman, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, and Pugh
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Changing the name of the Office of the Deaf and Hard of Hearing to the Office of the Deaf, Hard of Hearing, and DeafBlind; changing the name of the Maryland Advisory Council on the Deaf and Hard of Hearing to the Maryland Advisory Council on the Deaf, Hard of Hearing, and DeafBlind; and making conforming changes.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/08/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/07/2014
Legislative Date
1/07/2014
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {487470/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
8
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
9
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
11
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/08/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/07/2014 1/07/2014 Hearing 1/15 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments {487470/1 Report Adopted 8
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 8
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 9
House 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 11
House 3/07/2014 3/11/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-302, 7-128 )
(   9-2401, 9-2402, 9-2404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM