Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Display of the POW/MIA Flag on State Building Grounds
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Edwards, Waugh, DeGrange, Klausmeier, Currie, Peters, and Astle
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of General Services and the Secretary of Transportation to cause the POW/MIA flag to be flown on the grounds of State buildings under their control whenever the flag of the United States is flown; defining "POW/MIA flag" as the POW/MIA flag of the National League of Families of American Prisoners and Missing in Southeast Asia; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0391
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0381 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/24/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 9/24/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM