Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer Shows
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting an out-of-state dealer of Class M motor homes or Class G trailers from specified license requirements solely for the purpose of displaying and selling vehicles at a specified vehicle show in Wicomico County; authorizing specified out-of-state dealers and salesmen to participate in a specified vehicle show in Wicomico County; authorizing specified dealers and salesmen to conduct all activities involved in a vehicle sale at a specified vehicle show in Wicomico County; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/26/2016
Legislative Date
7/26/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/26/2016 7/26/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer Shows
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-302, 15-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM