Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Investment Program - Eligibility - Drug Testing
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Adding specified eligibility requirements for individuals applying for or receiving temporary cash assistance benefits under the Family Investment Program (FIP) related to substance abuse screening and testing; establishing that an applicant or a recipient is disqualified from the FIP under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014, July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/10/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/10/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101 )
(   5-301, 5-308, 5-312, 5-314 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM