Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Personnel - Professional Service - Maryland School for the Deaf - Teachers
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that teachers employed by the Maryland School for the Deaf are in the professional service in the State Personnel Management System.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0597
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/28/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 9/28/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-304 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM