Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Tax Year 2014 - Technical Correction
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying, for the 2014 taxable year, that 25 percent is the applicable percentage of the federal earned income credit used for determining the amount that an individual may claim as a refund under the Maryland earned income credit under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2015
Legislative Date
1/16/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 12:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2015
Legislative Date
1/23/2015
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
11
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2015
Legislative Date
1/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
11
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
13
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
14
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2015 1/16/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 1/27 at 12:45 p.m.
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/23/2015 1/23/2015 Hearing 1/27 at 2:30 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2015 1/28/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 11
Senate 1/28/2015 1/28/2015 Second Reading Passed 11
Senate 1/30/2015 1/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 13
House 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 14
House 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/05 at 2:15 p.m.
House 2/06/2015 2/09/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 20
House 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Second Reading Passed 20
House 2/12/2015 2/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 22
Senate 2/13/2015 2/13/2015 Returned Passed 22
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 143
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-704 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM