Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsored by
Senator Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the amount of wages of a judgment debtor that are exempt from attachment; making a conforming change; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0673
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/10/2017
Legislative Date
8/10/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/10/2017 8/10/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/23/2018 3/23/2018 Unfavorable Report by Finance
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-601.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM