Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates - Closing - Statement of Compensation and Reporting of Income (Mike Cady Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a court or a register of wills, after an estate has been closed, to provide to the personal representative of the estate a document stating the amount of compensation received by the personal representative and informing the personal representative that the compensation is income that must be reported to the Internal Revenue Service; requiring a court or register of wills to send a copy of the document to the Internal Revenue Service and the Office of the Comptroller; applying the Act only prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
8/13/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 8/13/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Senate 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM