Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Secretary of State)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering certain classes of goods and services for which a person may register a mark; prohibiting a person from registering a certain name or surname as a mark; requiring an applicant for registration of a mark or renewal of a mark to submit 3 different specimens or reproductions of the mark as used; prohibiting the specimens or reproductions from including certain business papers; requiring the Secretary of State to include a full description of the mark on a certain certificate of registration; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/26/2019
Legislative Date
8/26/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/26/2019 8/26/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM