Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Deer Hunting on Private Property - Sundays
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to hunt deer on private property in Queen Anne's County using specified hunting equipment on specified Sundays during specified hunting seasons.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (119-16)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/19/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Second Reading Passed 49
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 51
House 3/22/2013 3/19/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 52
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (119-16) 64
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM