Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification Policies - Repeal of Submission Requirement
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - State Police)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing requirements that each law enforcement agency in the State file a copy of its written policy relating to eyewitness identification with the Department of State Police and that the Department of State Police compile and allow public inspection of the policies.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/05/2016
Legislative Date
10/05/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/05/2016 10/05/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification Policies - Repeal of Submission Requirement
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Favorable Adopted 14
Senate 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Second Reading Passed 14
Text - Third - Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification Policies - Repeal of Submission Requirement
Senate 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 16
House 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Referred Judiciary 18
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Returned Passed 52
Post Passage 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification Policies - Repeal of Submission Requirement
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-506, 3-515 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM