Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to sell or lease to a private entity the naming rights for rest areas and welcome centers, as specified; prohibiting the sale or lease of rest area and welcome center naming rights unless the Administration makes certain determinations; requiring the term of a contract for the sale or lease of naming rights to be at least 1 year; requiring the proceeds from the sale or lease of naming rights for rest areas and welcome centers to be credited to the Transportation Trust Fund; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0054
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/17/2017
Legislative Date
8/17/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (124-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/17/2017 8/17/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 20
Text - Third - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-1) 22
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Environment and Transportation 23
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Third Reading Passed (124-0) 63
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Text - Chapter - State Highway Administration - Sale or Lease of Naming Rights for Rest Areas and Welcome Centers
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-204, 8-208 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM