Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology
Sponsored by
Senators Young, Hough, and Montgomery
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology; altering the name of the Frederick Center for Research and Education in Science and Technology (CREST) and the name of the Governing Board; altering the powers and duties of the Board to require the Board to operate and exercise general control over Frederick CREST; requiring the Board to submit an adopted mission statement to the Maryland Higher Education Commission; making the Act an emergency measure; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0037
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/19/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2015
Legislative Date
2/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {444237/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
23
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2015
Legislative Date
3/04/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/11/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2015
Legislative Date
3/27/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 1/16/2015 1/19/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/12/2015 2/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {444237/1 Report Adopted 23
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 23
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 25
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 First Reading Appropriations 27
House 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/04/2015 3/04/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 3/11/2015 3/11/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/31/2015 3/27/2015 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 58
Senate 4/02/2015 3/28/2015 Returned Passed 55
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   24-1001, 24-1002, 24-1003, 24-1004 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM