Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled Veterans
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the Department of Natural Resources submit a certain report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2019; and repealing the termination provision for certain provisions of law relating to the issuance of complimentary or discounted hunting and fishing licenses to certain military personnel, former prisoners of war, recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and disabled veterans.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0236
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
7/14/2019
Legislative Date
7/14/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 7/14/2019 7/14/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled Veterans
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM