Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Designations - State Sandwich - Soft-Shell Crab Sandwich
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Designating the soft-shell crab sandwich as the State sandwich.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0013
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
7/20/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-1)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 7/20/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/28/2013 3/29/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 56
Senate 3/29/2013 3/25/2013 Second Reading Passed 56
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Third Reading Passed (43-1) 58
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 60
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM