Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Commerce)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the purpose of the Partnership for Workforce Quality Program and the eligible uses of grants under the Program to include training for new employees; increasing from 60% to 80% the minimum percentage of the money available to the Program that must be reserved for certain employers and, for those employers, increasing from 150 to 500 the maximum number of employees based in the State; and establishing that a maximum of $200,000 of the money available to the Program may be provided to a certain employer.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/16/2019
Legislative Date
9/16/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/20/2019
Legislative Date
12/20/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/16/2019 9/16/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/20/2019 12/20/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Partnership for Workforce Quality Program - Alterations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM