Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program - Funding Extension
Sponsored by
Senators Astle, Miller, Conway, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Benson, Young, and Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the limitations on the requirement to provide specified funding in specified fiscal years to the Chesapeake Conservation Corps Program for specified purposes from the Environmental Trust Fund; requiring specified funding for the Corps Program each fiscal year; extending the termination date of a specified surcharge on electrical energy distributed to retail electric customers in the State; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0385
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
8/27/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2013
Legislative Date
1/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {494132/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2013
Legislative Date
1/29/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2013
Legislative Date
1/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/01/2013
Legislative Date
2/01/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {730513/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-7)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 8/27/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 1/28/2013 1/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Favorable with Amendments {494132/1 Report Adopted 14
Senate 1/29/2013 1/29/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 14
Senate 1/31/2013 1/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 16
House 2/01/2013 2/01/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 18
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/29/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {730513/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (130-7) 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Senate Concur - House Amendments 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Passed Enrolled 62
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 434
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-302, 8-1913, 8-1921 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM