Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nutrient Management - Phosphorus Risk Assessment Tool or Index - Economic Impact Analysis
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Agriculture to prepare an economic impact analysis before making any change to a specified phosphorus risk assessment tool or index; requiring the economic impact analysis to estimate the cost or economic benefit of a proposed change to a phosphorus risk assessment tool or index to a person required to have a nutrient management plan for nitrogen and phosphorus; requiring the economic impact analysis to include estimates directly related to specified effects of the proposed change; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0193
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/16/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2014
Legislative Date
1/21/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/16/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/21/2014 1/21/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-801, 8-804.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM