Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Blighted Property - Nuisance Abatement
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a local government to use a specified process to remediate blighted property; requiring the owner of a blighted property, on notification from the appropriate unit of local government, to remediate the property's blighted condition in a specified manner; requiring the appropriate unit of local government to send a specified notice to specified lienholders; authorizing the appropriate unit of local government to grant an extension of the required time periods; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
8/23/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {818571/2
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {818571/2
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Getty) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {818571/2 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
55A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 8/23/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments {818571/2 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 49
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {818571/2 50
Senate 3/21/2013 3/19/2013 Special Order until 3/22 (Senator Getty) Adopted 50
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {818571/2 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 52
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 55A
House 3/26/2013 3/26/2013 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/05/2013 4/06/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-120.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM