Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Peace Orders and Protective Orders - Burden of Proof
Sponsored by
Senator Frosh
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Changing the standard of proof, from clear and convincing evidence to a preponderance of the evidence, by which a judge in a peace order hearing must make specified findings before the judge may issue a final peace order or mutual peace orders; changing the standard of proof by which a judge in a protective order hearing must make specified findings before the judge may grant a final protective order or mutual protective orders or extend the term of a protective order; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0333
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/17/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/17/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-506, 4-507 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM