Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Bates, Waugh, and Salling
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Proposing an amendment to the Maryland Constitution to establish a Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund to be used only for nonpoint source pollution control projects except under specified circumstances; prohibiting the transfer of funds in the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund to the General Fund or a special fund of the State except under specified circumstances; submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0302
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1116 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Contingency - on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/19/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {684934/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/14/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2015 1/19/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {684934/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/17/2015 3/14/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 44
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM