Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Prohibition Against Smoking in Vehicle Containing Young Child
Sponsored by
Senators Zirkin and Forehand
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the driver of a motor vehicle in which a person who is under the age of 8 years is a passenger from smoking a tobacco product or allowing a passenger to smoke in the motor vehicle; establishing a fine of up to $50 for a violation of the Act; specifying that the Act does not apply to a mobile home under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0528
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0559 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/01/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {583625/1 Rejected (17-22)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2013
Legislative Date
3/15/2013
Action
Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {523121/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (27-20)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 11/01/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable 45
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Reilly) Adopted 45
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 46
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {583625/1 Rejected (17-22) 46
Senate 3/15/2013 3/15/2013 Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Pipkin) Adopted 46
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Floor Amendment (Senator Pipkin) {523121/1 Withdrawn 47
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Second Reading Passed 47
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (27-20) 49
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 50
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1130, 27-115 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM