Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Ransomware
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from knowingly possessing certain ransomware with the intent to use that ransomware for introduction into the computer, computer network, or computer system of another person without the authorization of the other person; establishing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of a misdemeanor and on conviction is subject to imprisonment not exceeding 10 years or a fine not exceeding $10,000 or both; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0215
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0151 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
5/08/2019
Legislative Date
5/08/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Ransomware
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 5/08/2019 5/08/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crimes Involving Computers - Ransomware
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM