Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Queen Anne's County - Beer, Wine and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating in Queen Anne's County a beer, wine and liquor tasting license; specifying to whom the license may be issued; setting maximum limits on the amounts of individual servings; specifying that the license may be issued for tasting purposes only; and establishing a $100 license fee.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0199
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1062 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/15/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
35
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/06/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 11/15/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 33
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Second Reading Passed 33
Senate 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 35
House 2/28/2013 2/28/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 37
House 4/06/2013 4/06/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-410.2, 8-410.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM