Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Chesapeake College - Authorization of Debt for Capital Projects - Simple Majority Plus One Requirement
Sponsored by
Senators Colburn and Hershey (By Request - Caroline County Commissioners and Dorchester County Council)
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the budget approval process for Chesapeake College to require that capital items or programs that would require specified debt service payments be approved by a simple majority plus one of the member counties that support the college; providing that capital items or programs that are not approved by a simple majority plus one are deleted from the proposed budget and the remainder of the budget is subject to a simple majority approval requirement; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0147 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/23/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/23/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-301 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM