Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Child Abuse and Neglect - Expungement of Reports and Records - Time Period
Sponsored by
Senators DeGrange and Ready
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a local department of social services to expunge a report of suspected abuse or neglect and all assessments and investigative findings within 2 years after the date of referral if the report is ruled out and no further reports of abuse or neglect are received during the 2 years; and authorizing a local department to immediately expunge specified reports and records of suspected child abuse and neglect under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0007
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0012 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/07/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {398571/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {702218/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 10/07/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments {398571/1 Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/09/2016 2/09/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19
Senate 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 21
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary 23
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/08/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {702218/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 68
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Senate Concur - House Amendments 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Passed Enrolled 66
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-707 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM