Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Veterans Affairs - Maryland Prisoner of War Medal
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating a Maryland Prisoner of War Medal; authorizing, except under specified circumstances, the Governor to award the Medal to any prisoners of war who meet specified residency requirements; requiring the Secretary, in consultation with the Adjutant General, to determine whether to grant prisoner of war status to specified individuals for purposes of consideration for the Medal; establishing the Maryland Prisoner of War Medal Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1447
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
8/10/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 8/10/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM