Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course
Sponsored by
Senator DeGrange
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (136-0)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination of a distribution of certain local impact grant funds from video lottery terminal proceeds to communities within 3 miles of the Laurel Race Course.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0130
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/20/2017
Legislative Date
10/20/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2018
Legislative Date
1/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
15 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/01/2018
Legislative Date
2/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
17 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2018
Legislative Date
2/02/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
18 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {375067/1 Adopted
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/20/2017 10/20/2017 Pre-filed
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course
Senate 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 Hearing 1/24 at 2:15 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Favorable Adopted 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 1/30/2018 1/30/2018 Second Reading Passed 15 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Distribution to Communities Near Laurel Race Course
Senate 2/01/2018 2/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 17 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/02/2018 2/02/2018 Referred Ways and Means 18 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Favorable with Amendments {375067/1 Adopted 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2018 3/22/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 56 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page