Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Liability
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Transportation)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the liability of the Maryland Transit Administration in a tort action to $800,000 to a single claimant for injuries arising from a single incident or occurrence; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
By Request of the Governor
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/23/2020
Legislative Date
9/23/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/28/2020
Legislative Date
12/28/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Liability
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2021
Legislative Date
1/04/2021
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 9/23/2020 9/23/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 12/28/2020 12/28/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 11:00 a.m.
Text - First - Maryland Transit Administration - Limitation of Liability
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/04/2021 1/04/2021 Hearing 1/14 at 11:30 a.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/15/2021 2:20 PM
Click to return on the top page