Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporations and Business Entities - Filing Fees and Combined Reporting
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the State Department of Assessments and Taxation from imposing a fee for the filing of specified documents by corporations or business entities with 10 or fewer employees; requiring specified corporations to compute Maryland taxable income using a specified combined reporting method; requiring the Comptroller to report to the General Assembly, on or before March 31 of each calendar year, an estimate of the total additional revenue to be collected as a result of the specified requirement; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1419
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0670 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/06/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 7/06/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
(   10-402.1, 10-402.2, 10-811 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page