Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health Program
Sponsored by
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee (By Request - Departmental - Juvenile Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing that a juvenile informal adjustment process may exceed 90 days if a juvenile intake officer determines that additional time is necessary for a child to participate in a substance-related disorder treatment program or a mental health program that is part of the informal adjustment process.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
10/20/2016
Legislative Date
10/20/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {908279/1 Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 10/20/2016 10/20/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health Program
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {908279/1 Adopted 19
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 19
Text - Third - Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health Program
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Judiciary 25
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 194
Text - Chapter - Juvenile Law - Informal Adjustment - Mental Health Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM