Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
Sponsored by
Senator Hough
Status
In the House - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Commissioner of Correction to provide a pre-release inmate with a reentry kit that includes clothing, an identification card, contact information on reentry services, information on Medicaid and the Maryland Health Benefit Exchange and public transportation; providing that a person who uses a firearm in a the commission of a crime of violence is guilty of a felony and establishes certain penalties; establishing that a person found guilty of the theft of a firearm is guilty of a felony; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/12/2019
Legislative Date
8/12/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2020
Legislative Date
1/13/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/06/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {808078/1 Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2020
Legislative Date
3/03/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-4)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/12/2019 8/12/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Crime of Violence - Definition
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 3:00 p.m.
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/13/2020 1/13/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2020 3/06/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Favorable with Amendments {808078/1 Adopted 42
Senate 3/06/2020 3/03/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Text - Third - Crimes – Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Third Reading Passed (43-4) 44
House 3/10/2020 3/07/2020 Referred Judiciary 44
House 3/12/2020 3/12/2020 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2020 3/14/2020 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/23/2020 8:47 AM