Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Carroll County - Gaming
Sponsored by
Carroll County Senators
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing specified organizations in Carroll County to conduct a card game, card tournament, or casino night under specified circumstances; requiring an organization to obtain a permit from the Board of License Commissioners for Carroll County before conducting a card game, card tournament, or casino night; requiring an organization that seeks a permit to meet specified requirements; specifying that a card game, card tournament, or casino night may be managed and organized by specified organizations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0158
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0430 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/25/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/2014
Legislative Date
1/01/2014
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2014
Legislative Date
1/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/28/2014
Legislative Date
1/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
14
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
1/31/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {175466/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/25/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/01/2014 1/01/2014 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2014 1/27/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 14
Senate 1/28/2014 1/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 14
Senate 1/30/2014 1/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 16
House 1/31/2014 1/31/2014 First Reading Ways and Means 18
House 3/14/2014 3/14/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable with Amendments {175466/1 Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-1) 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-906, 13-906.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM