Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tobacco Taxes - Healthy Maryland Initiative
Sponsored by
Senator Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified fees for licenses for tobacco manufacturers, retailers, and storage warehouses; altering specified fees for licenses for other tobacco products manufacturers, retailers, tobacconists, and storage warehouses; requiring a specified level of funding for the Tobacco Use Prevention and Cessation Program; altering the tobacco tax rates on cigarettes and other tobacco products; requiring a person to obtain specified permits before selling and shipping directly to a consumer in the State; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0108
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2015
Legislative Date
1/20/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2015
Legislative Date
1/21/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2015 1/20/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation and Finance
Senate 1/21/2015 1/21/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 Hearing 2/04 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16.5-203, 16.7-101 through 16.7-114, 16-101, 16-204 )
(   12-101, 12-105, 12-202, 12-204, 12-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM