Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Higher Education - Community Colleges - Workforce Development Sequence Grants and Scholarships
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing Workforce Development Sequence grants and scholarships; requiring the Office of Student Financial Assistance in the Maryland Higher Education Commission to disburse grants to community colleges in the State in order for specified community colleges to award scholarships to students who are enrolled in a Workforce Development Sequence and demonstrate financial need; requiring the Governor annually to include $2,000,000 in the State budget for the Workforce Development Sequence grants; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/20/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/19/2016
Action
Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 10/20/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 3:30 p.m.
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/19/2016 1/19/2016 Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   18-101, 18-3101 through 18-3107 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM