Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Registration - Special Vintage Reproduction Registration Plate
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to develop and make available a specially designed vintage reproduction registration plate; prescribing who may apply for and the classes of vehicles eligible for the registration plate; providing the manner in which fees will be established, collected, and distributed in connection with the registration plate; requiring that the registration plate be available for a specified time and resemble a specified registration plate issued by the State; and providing for a delayed effective date.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0977
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0001 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
7/20/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-1)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 7/20/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 45
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Second Reading Passed 45
Senate 3/18/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-1) 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 49
House 3/25/2013 3/25/2013 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-619.3 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM