Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearm - Definition
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "regulated firearm" to include the Anderson Manufacturing .223 caliber AM-15 and .300 caliber AM-15.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/13/2019
Legislative Date
8/13/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Regulated Firearm - Definition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/03/2020
Legislative Date
1/03/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/13/2019 8/13/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Regulated Firearm - Definition
Senate 1/03/2020 1/03/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM