Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Planning - Collateral Consequences for Individuals With Criminal Records - Study
Sponsored by
Senator Ellis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Department of Planning in coordination with the Maryland State Data Center to study, report on, and make recommendations relating to certain collateral consequences for individuals with criminal records; requiring the Department to report certain information to the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2021; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
11/01/2020
Legislative Date
11/01/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2021
Legislative Date
1/22/2021
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 11/01/2020 11/01/2020 Pre-filed
Senate 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Department of Planning - Collateral Consequences for Individuals With Criminal Records - Study
Senate 1/22/2021 1/22/2021 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/22/2021 1:55 PM
Click to return on the top page