Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Organ Donation - Presumed Consent (Patricia Hanberry Gift of Life Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to notify an applicant for a driver's license or identification card that the applicant shall be deemed to have consented to be an organ donor unless the applicant expressly chooses not to consent; requiring the Administration to provide for a method by which the applicant can designate that the applicant does not consent to being an organ donor; and requiring the Administration to indicate whether an individual is an organ donor on the individual's driver's license or identification card.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0171
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
8/14/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/17/2012 8/14/2012 Pre-filed
Senate 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM