Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting the sale of diapers from the sales and use tax.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0345 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/14/2019
Legislative Date
8/14/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/14/2019 8/14/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM