Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Violence - Persons Eligible for Relief
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, for specified purposes relating to domestic violence, the definition of "person eligible for relief" to include an individual who has had a sexual relationship with the respondent.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0775
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0490 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
10/30/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/05/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
21
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 10/30/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/31/2014 2/04/2014 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 19
Senate 2/05/2014 2/05/2014 Second Reading Passed 19
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 21
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading Judiciary 24
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM