Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving While License is Suspended - Prison Sentence Repeal
Sponsored by
Senator Brochin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the prison sentence for driving a motor vehicle while a person's license or privilege to drive is suspended under specified provisions of State law relating to the lapse of required security, noncompliance with traffic citations, and nonpayment of fines; and repealing the prison sentences for driving a motor vehicle while a person's license or privilege to drive is suspended by another state for failure to comply with a specified notice to appear in court or to pay a specified fine; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0348
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
10/22/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/16/2015 10/22/2015 Pre-filed
Senate 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   27-101 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM