Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Law Enforcement Officers (Blue Lives Matter Act of 2017)
Sponsored by
Senators Simonaire, Norman, Bates, Salling, Waugh, Eckardt, and Ready
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Including law enforcement officers within the scope of specified prohibitions against committing crimes against specified persons, damaging property of specified persons, and burning objects and damaging specified buildings in circumstances exhibiting animosity against persons or groups due to race, color, religious beliefs, sexual orientation, gender, disability, national origin, or status as homeless.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0025
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
8/03/2016
Legislative Date
8/03/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 8/03/2016 8/03/2016 Pre-filed
Senate 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Law Enforcement Officers (Blue Lives Matter Act of 2017)
Senate 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
(   10-301, 10-304, 10-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page