Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions
Sponsored by
Chair, Finance Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the information required to be included in a certain annual report required to be submitted to certain persons by the Health Services Cost Review Commission; altering a certain reporting date from October 1 to May 1 of each year; repealing the requirement that the Commission annually publish certain acute care hospital charges; authorizing the Commission, on request of the Secretary of Health, to assist in the implementation of federally approved model programs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
9/24/2019
Legislative Date
9/24/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/19/2019
Legislative Date
12/19/2019
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 9/24/2019 9/24/2019 Pre-filed
Senate 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Finance
Senate 12/19/2019 12/19/2019 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:41 AM