Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Sale of Drug Paraphernalia to a Minor - Local Law Authorizing Business License Revocation for a Second or Subsequent Violation
Sponsored by
Senator Benson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of a county or a municipal corporation to adopt a local law that authorizes the county or municipal corporation to revoke or not to renew the business license of an establishment for the second or subsequent conviction of an employee of the establishment if the violation involves selling or delivering drug paraphernalia to a minor and occurs on the property of the business establishment.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1316
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0117 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
11/04/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
12/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/02/2014
Legislative Date
1/02/2014
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/30/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 12/18/2013 11/04/2013 Pre-filed
Senate 12/18/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/02/2014 1/02/2014 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/29/2014 1/30/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-619 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM